FL S1252 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 887 -SJ 1004
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 887 -SJ 1004
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing credit for the sale of tobacco products to be extended to a retail dealer under specified conditions; limiting to the Department of Business and Professional Regulation the authority to reinstate a license that has become void under certain circumstances; authorizing distance learning courses as an acceptable alternative to classroom instruction for renewal of a real estate instructor permit; revising procedures for cosmetology licensure by endorsement, etc.
Title
Business and Professional Regulation
Sponsors
Senate Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations | Sen. Don Gaetz [R] | Sen. Dennis Jones [R] | Senate Regulated Industries Committee |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 887 -SJ 1004 | |
2012-03-08 | Read 2nd time -SJ 1004 | |
2012-03-06 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/12 | |
2012-03-05 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 805 | |
2012-03-05 | Withdrawn from Budget -SJ 805 | |
2012-03-01 | CS/CS by Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations read 1st time -SJ 751 | |
2012-03-01 | Now in Budget -SJ 743 | |
2012-02-28 | CS/CS by Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 743 | |
2012-02-23 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations, 02/28/12, 10:45 am, 401 Senate Office Building | |
2012-02-07 | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time -SJ 332 | |
2012-02-07 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations -SJ 328 | |
2012-02-06 | Now in Budget | |
2012-02-06 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-02-02 | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 326 | |
2012-01-30 | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 02/02/12, 3:15 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-13 | Introduced -SJ 137 | |
2012-01-11 | Referred to Regulated Industries; Criminal Justice; Budget -SJ 137 | |
2011-12-13 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
210 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
210 | 181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
310 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
455 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
455 | 213 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
455 | 2179 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
455 | 271 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
455 | 273 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
455 | 275 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
475 | 451 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
475 | 611 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
475 | 6171 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
475 | 6235 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
475 | 6245 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
476 | 188 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
477 | 0135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
477 | 019 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
477 | 0263 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
548 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
548 | 0065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
548 | 007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
548 | 008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
548 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |