FL S1260 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the use of electronic benefits transfer cards to purchase soft drinks or candy; directing the Department of Children and Families to request a waiver to prohibit the use of Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program benefits to purchase soft drinks or candy, etc.
Title
Restrictions on Use of Public Assistance Benefits
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Bean [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 4 NAYS 1 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 04/03/17, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H593 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
402 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
414 | 457 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1260 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1260/BillText/Filed/HTML |