FL S1266 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting a restriction on a mortgagee to request a court to order a mortgagor defendant to make payments or to vacate the premises during an action to foreclose on residential real estate; making technical and grammatical changes, etc.
Title
Actions for Foreclosure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Judiciary | |
2012-01-13 | Introduced -SJ 140 | |
2012-01-11 | Referred to Judiciary; Banking and Insurance; Budget -SJ 140 | |
2011-12-13 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1266 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1266/BillText/Filed/HTML |