FL S1266 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the State Constitution to automatically restore the voting rights of convicted felons after a specified time, etc.
Title
Automatic Restoration of Felons' Voting Rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Rules |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H565 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1266 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1266/BillText/Filed/HTML |