FL S1274 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Ratifying a specified rule relating to the Florida Workers' Compensation Health Care Provider Reimbursement Manual, for the sole and exclusive purpose of satisfying any condition on effectiveness pursuant to s. 120.541(3), F.S., which requires ratification of any rule meeting any specified thresholds for likely adverse impact or increase in regulatory costs, etc.
Title
Ratification of Rules of the Department of Financial Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died on Calendar |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/09/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 01/26/22, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/18/22, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1123 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee