FL S1314 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring pari-mutuel permitholders to pay the Division of Pari-mutuel Wagering within the Department of Business and Professional Regulation a specified percentage of the gross revenue derived from certain wagers; requiring the division to deposit the funds into the Greyhound Racing Compensation Trust Fund; requiring slot machine licensees to pay the division a specified percentage of the monthly gross revenue derived from slot machines; requiring cardroom licensees to pay the division a specified percentage of the monthly gross receipts, etc.
Title
Payments to the Greyhound Racing Compensation Trust Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1316 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
H803 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Gaming Control Subcommittee
H805 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Gaming Control Subcommittee
H803 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Gaming Control Subcommittee
H805 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Gaming Control Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
550 | 916 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
551 | 1065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
849 | 086 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1314 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1314/BillText/Filed/HTML |