FL S1328 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Congress of the United States to amend federal law to eliminate the offset for Dependency and Indemnity Compensation administered by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs imposed on benefits received by military widows and widowers through the Survivor Benefit Plan administered by the United States Department of Defense.
Title
Survivor Benefit Plan/Military Widows and Widowers [GPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Don Gaetz [R] | Sen. Ronda Storms [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Messages | |
2010-04-28 | In Messages | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00956; Adopted -SJ 00957 | |
2010-04-21 | Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 00702; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | |
2010-04-14 | Now in Rules -SJ 00551 | |
2010-04-13 | Favorable by Health and Human Services Appropriations; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 00551 | |
2010-04-08 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Appropriations, 04/13/10, 2:45 pm, 110-S | |
2010-03-03 | Now in Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00183 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Military Affairs and Domestic Security; Health and Human Services Appropriations; Rules -SJ 00094; On Committee agenda-- Military Affairs and Domestic Security, 03/02/10, 10:15 am, 37-S; Favorable by Military Affairs and Domestic Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00183 | |
2010-02-25 | On Committee agenda-- Military Affairs and Domestic Security, 03/02/10, 10:15 am, 37-S | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Military Affairs and Domestic Security; Health and Human Services Appropriations; Rules | |
2010-01-21 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0781 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council