FL S1358 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring proof of a taxpayer identification number or other specified identification number for certain applicants for a driver license; authorizing additional specified documents that are issued by foreign governments to satisfy proof-of-identity requirements; prohibiting the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles from waiving certain tests for applicants who provide proof of identity using specified foreign documents, etc.
Title
Driver Licenses and Identification Cards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Infrastructure and Security |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H969 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
322 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1358 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1358/BillText/Filed/HTML |