FL S1360 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Directing the Fish and Wildlife Conservation Commission to protect certain declassified species; prohibiting the commission from considering certain costs when designating a species as endangered or threatened; revising criteria for placement of species on the Regulated Plant Index by the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services; directing the department, in consultation with the Endangered Plant Advisory Council, to protect certain declassified species, etc.
Title
Endangered and Threatened Species
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/18/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-12 | Senate | CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 02/10/20, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2020-01-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1067 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
379 | 2291 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
581 | 185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |