FL S1362 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that a fine levied against a member or the tenants, guests, or invitees of a member may not become a lien against a parcel, etc.
Title
Fines Levied by a Homeowners' Association
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Rules |
2021-12-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1039 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
H6103 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
S1364 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
H6103 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
S1364 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1362 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1362/BillText/Filed/HTML |