FL S1390 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1169 (Ch. 2017-194)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1169 (Ch. 2017-194)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an honorary designation of a certain transportation facility in a specified county, etc.
Title
Transportation Facility Designations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1169 (Ch. 2017-194) |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Substituted HB 1169 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/17 |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/20/17, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 04/13/17, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/22/17, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1169 (Same As) 2017-06-28 - Chapter No. 2017-194
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1390 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1390/BillText/Filed/HTML |