FL S1392 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a direct-support organization of the Office of Tourism, Trade, and Economic Development to establish the Florida Golf Trail. Authorizes the direct-support organization to license the name "Florida Golf Trail" and receive compensation for such licensing. Provides that the direct-support organization and its licensees have exclusive use of such name. Revises the definition of the term "qualified active low-income community business" for purposes of the New Markets Development Program Act, etc.
Title
Economic Development
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 104 | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget -SJ 104 | |
2011-02-24 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1387 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
H1239 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S1846 () 2011-03-15 - Withdrawn prior to introduction -SJ 226
H1239 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S1846 () 2011-03-15 - Withdrawn prior to introduction -SJ 226
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
288 | 1229 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9913 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1392 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1392/BillText/Filed/HTML |