FL S1392 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing the week of May 5, 2024, as "Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week" in Florida and encouraging those experiencing uncontrollable, abnormal, and repetitive movements to consult their health care provider regarding their symptoms, etc.
Title
Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Adopted |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H8079 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Adopted by Publication
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1392 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1392/BillText/Filed/HTML |