FL S1394 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for patient discharge within a specified number of hours after admission to an ambulatory surgical center in conformance with federal law, etc.
Title
Ambulatory Surgical Centers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0999 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1394 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1394/BillText/Filed/HTML |