FL S1426 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing an obsolete provision requiring the Department of Environmental Protection to submit a specified report to the President of the Senate, the Speaker of the House of Representatives, and the appropriate substantive committees of the Legislature, etc.
Title
Comprehensive Statewide Water Conservation Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations | |
2012-02-14 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations | |
2012-02-14 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations -SJ 519 | |
2012-02-13 | Now in Budget -SJ 499 | |
2012-02-13 | Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 499 | |
2012-02-08 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 02/13/12, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-31 | Now in Agriculture -SJ 300 | |
2012-01-30 | Favorable by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 300 | |
2012-01-25 | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 01/30/12, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-13 | Introduced -SJ 153 | |
2012-01-13 | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Agriculture; Budget -SJ 153 | |
2012-01-04 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1426 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1426/BillText/Filed/HTML |