FL S1434 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a motor carrier weight inspection area of program responsibility within the Department of Transportation, which replaces motor carrier compliance. Creates the Office of Motor Carrier Compliance within the Division of the Florida Highway Patrol within the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles. Creates the Law Enforcement Consolidation Task Force. Provides for membership. Requires the task force to make recommendations and submit a report to the Legislature by a certain date. Provides for future expiration, etc.
Title
Office of Motor Carrier Compliance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-11 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/14/11, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed | |
2011-03-28 | Remaining references corrected to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Criminal Justice; Budget -SJ 303 | |
2011-03-24 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-03-22 | CS by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 286 | |
2011-03-17 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/22/11, 1:15 pm, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-11 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/16/11, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building --Amendment adopted - Temporarily postponed | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 107 | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Transportation; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget -SJ 108 | |
2011-02-25 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
311 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 3025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 3026 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 516 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 545 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 640 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
321 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
334 | 044 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |