FL S1434 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting a business that fails to satisfy the terms of its agreement with the Department of Economic Opportunity to apply for a prorated tax refund, etc.
Title
Tax Refund Program for Qualified Target Industry Businesses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax | |
2012-01-27 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax | |
2012-01-27 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax -SJ 282 | |
2012-01-26 | Now in Budget -SJ 279 | |
2012-01-26 | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 279 | |
2012-01-23 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/26/12, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-13 | Introduced -SJ 153 | |
2012-01-13 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Budget -SJ 153 | |
2012-01-04 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1434 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1434/BillText/Filed/HTML |