FL S1434 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the use of funds provided under the plan for the purchase of disposable diapers by parents receiving financial assistance under certain conditions and consistent with federal law, etc.
Title
Temporary Assistance for Needy Families State Plan
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0753 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1434 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1434/BillText/Filed/HTML |