FL S1434 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Agency for Health Care Administration to develop surveys to assess patient safety culture in certain health care facilities; requiring the submission of patient safety culture survey data as a condition of licensure, etc.
Title
Patient Safety Culture Surveys
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H375 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
400 | 991 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 8065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 810 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 820 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1434 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1434/BillText/Filed/HTML |