FL S1436 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Transportation to acquire the Garcon Point Bridge and related assets and purchase or retire specified outstanding bonds; requiring that the bridge be owned by the department and become part of the State Highway System upon acquisition, if acquired under specified provisions; authorizing the issuance of bonds to finance the department's acquisition of the bridge consistent with the department's existing bonding authority; repealing part IV of ch. 348, F.S., relating to the Santa Rosa Bay Bridge Authority, upon the department's acquisition of the bridge under specified provisions, etc.
Title
Garcon Point Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 1 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/21/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-30 | Senate | CS by Transportation read 1st time |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | CS by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/25/18, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2018-01-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1281 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
338 | 168 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 2275 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 965 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 966 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 967 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 968 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 969 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 97 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 971 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 972 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 973 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 974 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9751 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9761 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9771 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9781 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |