FL S1440 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2014-160)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2014-160)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the employment of minors in adult theaters; requiring adult theaters to verify the ages of employees and independent contractors and maintain specified documentation; eliminating the statute of limitations for prosecutions under a specified human trafficking provision; providing for expunction of criminal history records of certain criminal charges against victims of human trafficking that did not result in convictions, etc.
Title
Human Trafficking
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2014-160) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Now in Criminal Justice |
2014-04-03 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 04/01/14, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Criminal Justice; Appropriations |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1436 (Related) 2014-05-02 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2014-160)
S1426 (Related) 2014-05-02 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2014-160)
H1017 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2014-160)
H1019 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7141 (Ch. 2014-161), CS/CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2014-160)
H1021 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2014-160)
H0989 (Similar To) 2014-06-17 - Chapter No. 2014-160
S0768 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2014-160)
S1426 (Related) 2014-05-02 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2014-160)
H1017 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2014-160)
H1019 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7141 (Ch. 2014-161), CS/CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2014-160)
H1021 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2014-160)
H0989 (Similar To) 2014-06-17 - Chapter No. 2014-160
S0768 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2014-160)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
450 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
450 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
772 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 082 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 0877 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
787 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
787 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
787 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
794 | 056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
796 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
796 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
796 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
796 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
796 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
796 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
856 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
895 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
90 | 404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
938 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
938 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0435 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0583 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0585 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 059 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 606 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 607 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |