FL S1446 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1055 (Ch. 2021-223)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1055 (Ch. 2021-223)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public records requirements for a trade secret held by an agency; providing that an agency employee is not liable for the release of certain records; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Trade Secrets
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Boyd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1055 (Ch. 2021-223) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1055 (Same As) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-223
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
688 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
688 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
688 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1446 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1446/BillText/Filed/HTML |