FL S1478 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Higher Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Higher Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that an independent college or university that was a successor by merger to certain independent colleges or universities is eligible to receive William L. Boyd, IV, Florida resident access grant payments, etc.
Title
William L. Boyd, IV, Florida Resident Access Grant Program
Sponsors
Sen. Darren Soto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Higher Education |
2015-04-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Higher Education, 04/07/15, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1071 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died in Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1478 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1478/BillText/Filed/HTML |