FL S1478 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Chief Inspector General to meet specified qualifications applicable to agency inspectors general, to have open and direct access to the Governor, and to prepare an annual report containing specified information; exempting employees of an office of an agency inspector general and auditors of the Division of Accounting and Auditing of the Department of Financial Services from the Career Service System, etc.
Title
Inspectors General and Auditors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-04-19 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-17 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/17/17, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Judiciary; Rules |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1480 (Related) 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
H1283 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
H1285 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
H1283 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
H1285 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |