FL S1492 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing a presumption that a breeding female dog is being used for breeding purposes unless certain conditions are met; requiring certain dog breeders to apply for and obtain a certification of registration from the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services; authorizing the department to assess late filing penalties and to extend a renewal date for good cause for a specified number of days; authorizing the department to enter and inspect any dog breeding facility under certain circumstances; requiring dog breeders to microchip certain dogs, etc.
Title
Dog Breeding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Agriculture |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1494 (Related) 2023-05-05 - Died in Agriculture
S1496 (Related) 2023-05-05 - Died in Agriculture
H1581 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
H1583 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
H1585 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
S1496 (Related) 2023-05-05 - Died in Agriculture
H1581 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
H1583 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
H1585 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
585 | 007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
585 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
585 | 711 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
585 | 712 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
585 | 713 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
585 | 714 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
585 | 715 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
585 | 716 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1492 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1492/BillText/Filed/HTML |