FL S1532 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the responsibilities of specified counties and the state relating to financial support for juvenile detention care; requiring the Department of Juvenile Justice to provide specified information to specified counties, etc.
Title
Juvenile Detention Costs
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/01/14, 3:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/25/14, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Appropriations |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H5305 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2014-51)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
985 | 6015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 686 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |