FL S1556 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting individual limits on the amounts of sales tax refunds authorized for the purchase of building materials used in the rehabilitation of real property located in an enterprise zone or for the purchase of business property used by businesses in an enterprise zone; amending provisions relating to the Rural Job Tax Credit Program; revising the maximum percentage of total infrastructure project costs for which the Department of Economic Opportunity may award grants; amending provisions relating to a tax refund program for target industry businesses, etc.
Title
Economic Development
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2015-03-18 | Senate | References corrected to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Original reference(s)- removed: Regulated Industries |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0903 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee
S0392 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
H7067 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
S1214 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1216 (Ch. 2015-30)
S0392 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
H7067 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
S1214 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1216 (Ch. 2015-30)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
166 | 231 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
193 | 077 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
193 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
195 | 073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
195 | 099 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
196 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 054 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 096 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 098 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 182 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 0655 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
290 | 016 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1556 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1556/BillText/Filed/HTML |