FL S1556 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1381 (Ch. 2021-238)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1381 (Ch. 2021-238)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Health to develop and implement the Prevention of Maternal Mortality Grant Program by a specified date; requiring the department to award grants to certain training programs; requiring the department, in consultation with the Office of Program Policy Analysis and Government Accountability (OPPAGA), to conduct a certain study and submit a report to the Governor and Legislature by a specified date; requiring the department to develop and implement the Investments in Digital Tools to Promote Equity in Maternal Health Outcomes Program by a specified date, etc.
Title
Maternal Health Care Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1381 (Ch. 2021-238) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1540 (Similar To) 2021-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1381 (Ch. 2021-238)
H1383 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
H1381 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-238
H1383 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
H1381 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-238
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
383 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1556 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1556/BillText/Filed/HTML |