FL S1586 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Public Service Commission to hold public hearings to determine a disaster preparation and energy grid improvement plan for each public utility; requiring the commission to issue orders for the public utilities to implement their plans, etc.
Title
Energy Grid
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | CS by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities read 1st time |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Now in Regulated Industries |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | CS by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, 01/25/18, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Regulated Industries; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1038 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
H1411 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
H1411 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee