FL S1604 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1389
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1389
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Redesignating the offense of "video voyeurism" as "digital voyeurism"; providing reduced criminal penalties for certain violations by persons who are under 19 years of age; redesignating the offense of "video voyeurism dissemination" as "digital voyeurism dissemination", etc.
Title
Digital Voyeurism
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1389 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 1389 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/24 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/15/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2024-02-08 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/06/24, 11:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1389 (Same As) 2024-04-29 - Chapter No. 2024-132
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1012 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 417 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
435 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 074 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
810 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0584 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |