FL S1612 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the requirements for a good faith itemized estimate provided to a patient or prospective patient by a licensed facility for nonemergency medical services; requiring written patient consent for certain health care practitioners to bill a patient for services listed on the itemized estimate which are not covered by the patient's health insurance; providing that an insurer is solely liable for payment of certain fees for certain requested services under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Health Care Consumer Protection
Sponsors
Sen. Rene Garcia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
395 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 0575 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 64194 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1612 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1612/BillText/Filed/HTML |