FL S1612 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removing provisions that provide a limitation on the total sales by a specified corporation of certain products offered for purchase to a state agency, etc.
Title
Prison Industry Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167) |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/02/19, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Building |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/25/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6055 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-167, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), SB 1136 (Ch. 2019-53), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-167, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), SB 1136 (Ch. 2019-53), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1612 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1612/BillText/Filed/HTML |