FL S1638 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing counties and municipalities to exempt from taxation homestead property of certain parent or parents of certain unmarried veterans who died from combat-related causes while on active duty as members of the United States Armed Forces; authorizing the tax exemption to carry over or transfer under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Homestead Property Tax Exemptions
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Rader [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1636 (Related) 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
H745 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
H743 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
H745 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
H743 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1638 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1638/BillText/Filed/HTML |