FL S1638 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the punishment for certain civil infractions; defining the terms "characterizing flavor" and "flavored liquid nicotine"; prohibiting the sale, delivery, bartering, furnishing, or giving of flavored liquid nicotine to any person; prohibiting a person from engaging in certain activities relating to the promotion of nicotine dispensing devices and nicotine products for unlawful use; requiring retailers of electronic nicotine delivery systems to take certain actions when selling the devices, etc.
Title
Nicotine Products
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H151 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
S694 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
S810 (Similar To) 2020-09-08 - Vetoed by Governor
S694 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
S810 (Similar To) 2020-09-08 - Vetoed by Governor
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
386 | 212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
877 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1638 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1638/BillText/Filed/HTML |