FL S1678 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-105
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-105
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amending provisions which provide an exemption from public records requirements for social security numbers of current and former agency employees held by an employing agency; saving the exemption from repeal under the Open Government Sunset Review Act; authorizing an employing agency to disclose the social security number of a current or former agency employee under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
OGSR/Agency Personnel Information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#763 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#31 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#31 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-13 | Chapter No. 2014-105 | |
2014-06-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2014-04-25 | House | Passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-25 | House | Substituted for HB 7143 |
2014-04-24 | House | Received |
2014-04-24 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/14 |
2014-04-24 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2014-04-24 | House | In Messages |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/14 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/09/14, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/02/14, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Not Considered |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/25/14, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Rules |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Filed |
2014-03-14 | Senate | SPB 7080 submitted as a committee bill (SB 1678) by Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
Same As/Similar To
H7143 (Similar To) 2014-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1678 (Ch. 2014-105)