FL S1678 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Marjory Stoneman Douglas High School Victim Trust Fund within the Department of Education; providing the purpose of the trust fund; providing the funding sources for the trust fund; providing for future review and termination or re-creation of the trust fund, etc.
Title
Trust Funds/Marjory Stoneman Douglas High School Victim Trust Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Lauren Book [D] | Sen. Kevin Rader [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1680 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
S1682 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
H123 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
S1682 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
H123 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1678 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1678/BillText/Filed/HTML |