FL S1682 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public records requirements for information relating to investigations by the Department of Legal Affairs and law enforcement agencies of certain artificial intelligence transparency violations; providing that certain information received by the department remains confidential and exempt upon completion or inactive status of an investigation; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Artificial Intelligence Transparency Violations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2024-01-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/05/24, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2024-01-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/29/24, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Rules |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1680 (Related) 2024-04-29 - Chapter No. 2024-118
H1461 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
H1459 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table
H1461 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
H1459 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table