FL S1720 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-26 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00855; Substituted CS/HB 1551 -SJ 00855; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1551 (Ch. 2010-39) -SJ 00855
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-26 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00855; Substituted CS/HB 1551 -SJ 00855; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1551 (Ch. 2010-39) -SJ 00855
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Deletes a description of the board as a public-private entity. Revises the entities with whom the board may create partnerships for the development and expansion of black business enterprises. Requires the board to aid the development and expansion of black business enterprises by leveraging federal, state, local, and private funds. Deletes provisions providing for the board to recommend certification of eligible recipients for loans, etc.
Title
Black Business Investment Board, Inc. [CPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00855; Substituted CS/HB 1551 -SJ 00855; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1551 (Ch. 2010-39) -SJ 00855 | |
2010-04-19 | Favorable by- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00651; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00651 | |
2010-04-15 | Now in Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 00636; On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations, 04/19/10, 10:30 am, 309-C | |
2010-04-14 | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00636 | |
2010-04-12 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00552; On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/14/10, 1:00 pm, 110-S | |
2010-04-09 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-07 | CS by Commerce; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 00552; CS read 1st time on 04/14/10 -SJ 00562 | |
2010-04-02 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce, 04/07/10, 10:15 am, 401-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Commerce; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 00118 | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Commerce; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations | |
2010-02-04 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1551 (Similar To) 2010-05-07 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-39
H5611 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00011; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
H5611 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00011; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0288 | 707 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0288 | 709 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0288 | 7091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0288 | 7102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0288 | 71025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0288 | 712 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0288 | 714 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |