FL S1742 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for forfeiture of retirement benefits of correctional facility employees who commit certain violations; providing enhanced penalties for offenses involving introduction of contraband in correctional facilities when committed by correctional facility employees, etc.
Title
Correctional Facility Employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167) |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/25/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H41 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-167, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), SB 1136 (Ch. 2019-53), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-167, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), SB 1136 (Ch. 2019-53), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 3173 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 47 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1742 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1742/BillText/Filed/HTML |