FL S1748 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a plan for tourist development from allocating more than a certain percentage of the tax revenue to an individual project unless the governing board of the county approves such use by supermajority vote, etc.
Title
Tourist Development Tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Finance and Tax (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Favorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 02/08/24, 10:45 am, 37 Senate Building |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/23/24, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1599 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Ways & Means Committee
S7074 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7073
S7074 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7073