FL S1796 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the motor vehicle registration form, registration renewal form, driver's license application form, and driver's license application form for renewal issuance or renewal extension to include an option to make a voluntary contribution to aid the homeless. Provides that voluntary contributions for the homeless are not income of a revenue nature for the purpose of applying certain service charges, etc.
Title
Contributions to Relieve Homelessness [CPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Transportation | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Transportation; Finance and Tax; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00122 | |
2010-02-17 | Referred to Transportation; Finance and Tax; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-02-09 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0923 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
S2654 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health and Human Services Appropriations
S2654 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health and Human Services Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0320 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0322 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0322 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |