FL S1796 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1007 (Ch. 2013-258)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1007 (Ch. 2013-258)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising membership of the council; providing an exception to general law, etc.
Title
Lee County Tourist Development Council
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1007 (Ch. 2013-258) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1007 (Similar To) 2013-07-03 - Chapter No. 2013-258
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1796 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1796/BillText/Filed/HTML |