FL S1906 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring certain hemp extract products to be registered with the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services before being distributed or sold in this state; requiring registrants to renew registrations annually; requiring the department to deny applications that fail to meet the requirements; authorizing the department to issue and enforce stop-sale orders and revoke or suspend registrations for violations; requiring the department to order a manufacturer or distributor to cease operations or distribution under certain circumstances; prohibiting hemp extract products intended for ingestion from being sold to persons under a specified age, etc.
Title
Hemp Extract Products
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Agriculture |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1908 (Related) 2022-03-14 - Died in Agriculture
H679 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
H1289 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
S1268 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
H679 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
H1289 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
S1268 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
500 | 421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
581 | 217 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1906 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1906/BillText/Filed/HTML |