FL S1918 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring early learning coalitions to adopt a payment rate schedule rather than a payment schedule; requiring early learning coalitions to reimburse contracted school readiness program providers the minimum payment rate; revising the required contents of early learning coalition plans; directing the Division of Early Learning within the Department of Education to amend its Child Care and Development Fund Plan to identify certain personnel as essential workers for a specified purpose, etc.
Title
School Readiness Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Education |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1319 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
H1199 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S2524 (Similar To) 2022-06-03 - Chapter No. 2022-154
H1199 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S2524 (Similar To) 2022-06-03 - Chapter No. 2022-154
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 84 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 85 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 895 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1918 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1918/BillText/Filed/HTML |