FL S1958 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting qualified physicians from engaging in certain advertising for their practices relating to marijuana for medical use; prohibiting medical marijuana treatment centers and certain other individuals and entities from employing qualified physicians or having direct or indirect economic interests in qualified physician practices and medical marijuana testing laboratories; revising a provision relating to the potency of tetrahydrocannabinol in edibles dispensed by a medical marijuana treatment center; authorizing the Department of Health to select and test marijuana samples, rather than only edible samples, from cultivation, processing, and dispensing facilities, etc.
Title
Regulation of Medical Marijuana
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations; Rules |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1455 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Health & Human Services Committee
S1568 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in returning Messages
H1565 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table
S1568 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in returning Messages
H1565 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
381 | 986 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 988 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1958 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1958/BillText/Filed/HTML |