FL S1960 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1679
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1679
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the chief judge of the circuit to limit the number of attorneys on the circuit registry list; revising the procedures by which a regional conflict counsel is appointed by the Governor; providing that, if a regional counsel is unable to complete a full term in office, the Governor may immediately appoint an interim regional counsel to serve as regional counsel for that district until a new regional counsel is appointed; requiring the Florida Supreme Court Judicial Nominating Commission to provide the Governor with a list of nominees for appointment within 6 months after the date of a vacancy; authorizing a county and the Statewide Guardian Ad Litem Office to enter into an agreement whereby the county provides funding to the office in order to employ additional guardian ad litem personnel to serve in the county, etc.
Title
State Judicial System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#40 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1211 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#913 (Y: 107 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1211 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#913 (Y: 107 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1679 | |
2012-03-09 | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 -HJ 1612 | |
2012-03-09 | In returning messages | |
2012-03-09 | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 -SJ 1199 | |
2012-03-09 | Conference Committee Report received -SJ 1194 | |
2012-02-28 | Conference Committee appointed: Budget Conference Committee on Budget/Appropriations: Alexander (Chair), Negron (Vice Chair), Bennett (At Large), Gaetz (At Large), Gardiner (At Large), Joyner (At Large), Rich (At Large), Thrasher (At Large); Budget Conference Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice/Justice: Bogdanoff (Chair), Evers, Smith, Storms; Budget Conference Committee on Education Pre-K - 12/PreK-12: Simmons (Chair), Detert, Gardiner, Montford, Ring; Budget Conference Committee on Finance and Tax: Norman (Chair), Alexander, Gaetz, Siplin; Budget Conference Committee on General Government/Government Operations: Hays (Chair), Braynon, Bullard, Diaz de la Portilla, Dockery, Jones, Thrasher; Budget Conference Committee on Health and Human Services/Health Care: Negron (Chair), Fasano, Flores, Garcia, Oelrich, Rich, Richter, Sobel; Budget Conference Committee on Higher Education/Higher Education: Lynn (Chair), Altman, Sachs, Siplin, Wise; Budget Conference Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic | |
2012-02-28 | Conference Committee appointed: Representatives Glorioso (Chair), Eisnaugle, Grant, Harrell, McBurney, Metz, Perry, Pilon, Rouson, Soto, Waldman -HJ 899 | |
2012-02-27 | In returning messages | |
2012-02-27 | Refused to concur, acceded to request for conference committee -HJ 846 | |
2012-02-27 | Received -HJ 840 | |
2012-02-23 | In Messages | |
2012-02-23 | Immediately certified -SJ 615 | |
2012-02-23 | Read 2nd time -SJ 615 | |
2012-02-21 | Introduced -SJ 525 | |
2012-02-21 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/12 | |
2012-02-16 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 525 | |
2012-02-16 | SPB 7064 submitted as a committee bill (SB 1960) by Budget |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 5304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 8296 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 8297 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |