FL S1970 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died pending review, Rule 4.7(2), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 5101 (Ch. 2010-154)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died pending review, Rule 4.7(2), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 5101 (Ch. 2010-154)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Cites this act as the "High-Performing Teacher Bonuses Act." Requires that each school district allocate 100 percent of the funds received for instruction for the International Baccalaureate Program, Advanced International Certificate of Education, and the Advanced Placement Program. Requires that such funds be expended solely for administrative costs associated with such programs and teachers' bonuses, etc.
Title
Education/High-performing Teachers [WPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died pending review, Rule 4.7(2), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 5101 (Ch. 2010-154) | |
2010-04-09 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-06 | CS by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 7 NAYS 1 -SJ 00551; CS read 1st time on 04/14/10 -SJ 00564 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 04/06/10, 1:00 pm, 301-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00133 | |
2010-02-17 | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-02-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1287 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died pending review of CS, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 5101 (Ch. 2010-154)
H5101 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-154; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), SJR 2 (Passed)
H5101 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-154; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), SJR 2 (Passed)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1007 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |