FL S2416 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 951 (Ch. 2010-62), CS/HB 5401 (Ch. 2010-162), CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2010-114)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 951 (Ch. 2010-62), CS/HB 5401 (Ch. 2010-162), CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2010-114)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises background screening requirements for the Guardian Ad Litem Program, mental health personnel, nursing home personnel, home health agency personnel, nurse registry personnel, and companions and homemakers. Provides background screening requirements for prescribed pediatric extended care centers. Revises provisions relating to the Criminal Justice Information Program under the FDLE, etc.
Title
Background Screening [SPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 951 (Ch. 2010-62), CS/HB 5401 (Ch. 2010-162), CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2010-114) | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced -SJ 00207 | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Criminal Justice; Health Regulation; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00207 | |
2010-02-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0951 (Similar To) 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-62; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2010-114)
H1213 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Services Policy (HFPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2010-114), SB 1166 (Ch. 2010-193), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
S1974 (Similar To) 2010-04-21 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00700; Substituted CS/HB 951 -SJ 00700; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 951 (Ch. 2010-62), CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2010-114) -SJ 00700
S2678 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2010-114), SB 1166 (Ch. 2010-193), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
H7069 (Similar To) 2010-05-27 - Chapter No. 2010-114; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 5401 (Ch. 2010-162)
S1520 (Similar To) 2010-04-28 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00959; Amendment(s) adopted (886258, 636420, 348828, 343964) -SJ 00959; Substituted CS/HB 7069 -SJ 00960; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2010-114), CS/HB 951 (Ch. 2010-62), CS/HB 5401 (Ch. 2010-162) -SJ 00960
H1521 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2010-114)
S0752 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161), CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2010-114)
S1400 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Senate, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), CS/HB 5401 (Ch. 2010-162), CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2010-114)
H5401 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-162; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2010-114)
H1213 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Services Policy (HFPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2010-114), SB 1166 (Ch. 2010-193), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
S1974 (Similar To) 2010-04-21 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00700; Substituted CS/HB 951 -SJ 00700; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 951 (Ch. 2010-62), CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2010-114) -SJ 00700
S2678 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2010-114), SB 1166 (Ch. 2010-193), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
H7069 (Similar To) 2010-05-27 - Chapter No. 2010-114; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 5401 (Ch. 2010-162)
S1520 (Similar To) 2010-04-28 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00959; Amendment(s) adopted (886258, 636420, 348828, 343964) -SJ 00959; Substituted CS/HB 7069 -SJ 00960; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2010-114), CS/HB 951 (Ch. 2010-62), CS/HB 5401 (Ch. 2010-162) -SJ 00960
H1521 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2010-114)
S0752 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161), CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2010-114)
S1400 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Senate, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), CS/HB 5401 (Ch. 2010-162), CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2010-114)
H5401 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-162; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2010-114)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0039 | 821 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0215 | 5586 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0381 | 60225 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0393 | 0655 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0394 | 4572 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0400 | 215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0400 | 506 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0400 | 512 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0400 | 6065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0400 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0400 | 805 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0400 | 9065 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0400 | 934 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0400 | 953 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0400 | 955 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0400 | 964 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0400 | 980 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0400 | 991 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0408 | 806 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0408 | 808 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0408 | 809 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 907 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0429 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0429 | 174 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0429 | 67 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0429 | 69 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0429 | 911 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0429 | 919 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0430 | 60 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0435 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0435 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0435 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0435 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0435 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0435 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0435 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0435 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0464 | 018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0464 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0468 | 3101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0489 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0744 | 309 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0744 | 474 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0943 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0943 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0985 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0985 | 644 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |