FL S2476 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creates said trust fund within the OTTED in the Executive Office of the Governor. Provides the purpose of the fund. Provides sources of funds. Provides uses for the fund. Provides for the balance in the trust fund to be carried forward at the end of each fiscal year. Provides for future review and termination or re-creation of the trust fund.
Title
Space Business Investment & Financial Services TF [CPSC]
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations | |
2010-03-30 | Now in Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 00351 | |
2010-03-26 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-24 | CS by Commerce; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 00351; CS read 1st time on 03/30/10 -SJ 00367 | |
2010-03-19 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce, 03/24/10, 1:15 pm, 401-S | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced -SJ 00212 | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Commerce; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 00212 | |
2010-02-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S2500 (Similar To) 2010-04-28 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00984; Substituted CS/CS/HB 1389 -SJ 00984; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1389 (Ch. 2010-226), CS/HB 969 (Ch. 2010-222), CS/SB 1752 (Ch. 2010-147) -SJ 00984
H1389 (Similar To) 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-226; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 969 (Ch. 2010-222)
H1391 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Finance & Tax Council
H1389 (Similar To) 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-226; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 969 (Ch. 2010-222)
H1391 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Finance & Tax Council