FL S2508 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-11 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2016-66), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), HB 5101 (Ch. 2016-65)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-11 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2016-66), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), HB 5101 (Ch. 2016-65)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exception to the prohibition against a private entity swiping an individual's driver license or identification card for certain entities for certain purposes; requiring appeals related to Medicaid programs directly administered by the Agency for Health Care Administration to be directed to the agency; providing eligibility for optional payments for medical assistance and related services for certain lawfully residing children, etc.
Title
Health Care Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-11 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2016-66), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), HB 5101 (Ch. 2016-65) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Substituted HB 5101 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/10/16 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Filed |
2016-01-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/03/16, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building -- Submitted as Committee Bill; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
H0089 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5101 (Ch. 2016-65)
H5101 (Similar To) 2016-03-18 - Chapter No. 2016-65, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1083 (Ch. 2016-140), HB 5001 (Ch. 2016-66), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), CS/HB 7003 (Ch. 2016-3), CS/SB 12 (Ch. 2016-241)
S0248 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5101 (Ch. 2016-65)
S1250 (Similar To) 2016-03-09 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 423 (Ch. 2016-224), CS/HB 977 (Ch. 2016-231)
H5001 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Chapter No. 2016-66, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), HB 5005 (Ch. 2016-63), HB 5007 (Ch. 2016-64), HB 5101 (Ch. 2016-65), HB 5103 (Ch. 2016-25)
S2500 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2016-66), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), HB 5005 (Ch. 2016-63), HB 5007 (Ch. 2016-64), HB 5101 (Ch. 2016-65), HB 5103 (Ch. 2016-25)
H5003 (Similar To) 2016-03-18 - Chapter No. 2016-62, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 499 (Ch. 2016-128), CS/CS/CS/HB 589 (Ch. 2016-130), CS/CS/HB 719 (Ch. 2016-58), CS/HB 837 (Ch. 2016-137), CS/CS/HB 1083 (Ch. 2016-140), CS/HB 1335 (Ch. 2016-147), HB 5001 (Ch. 2016-66), HB 5101 (Ch. 2016-65), CS/HB 7003 (Ch. 2016-3), HB 7027 (Ch. 2016-181), CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237), CS/CS/HB 7061 (Ch. 2016-239), CS/SB 1322 (Ch. 2016-152)
H5101 (Similar To) 2016-03-18 - Chapter No. 2016-65, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1083 (Ch. 2016-140), HB 5001 (Ch. 2016-66), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), CS/HB 7003 (Ch. 2016-3), CS/SB 12 (Ch. 2016-241)
S0248 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5101 (Ch. 2016-65)
S1250 (Similar To) 2016-03-09 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 423 (Ch. 2016-224), CS/HB 977 (Ch. 2016-231)
H5001 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Chapter No. 2016-66, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), HB 5005 (Ch. 2016-63), HB 5007 (Ch. 2016-64), HB 5101 (Ch. 2016-65), HB 5103 (Ch. 2016-25)
S2500 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2016-66), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), HB 5005 (Ch. 2016-63), HB 5007 (Ch. 2016-64), HB 5101 (Ch. 2016-65), HB 5103 (Ch. 2016-25)
H5003 (Similar To) 2016-03-18 - Chapter No. 2016-62, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 499 (Ch. 2016-128), CS/CS/CS/HB 589 (Ch. 2016-130), CS/CS/HB 719 (Ch. 2016-58), CS/HB 837 (Ch. 2016-137), CS/CS/HB 1083 (Ch. 2016-140), CS/HB 1335 (Ch. 2016-147), HB 5001 (Ch. 2016-66), HB 5101 (Ch. 2016-65), CS/HB 7003 (Ch. 2016-3), HB 7027 (Ch. 2016-181), CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237), CS/CS/HB 7061 (Ch. 2016-239), CS/SB 1322 (Ch. 2016-152)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
322 | 143 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 285 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 811 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 814 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 904 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 906 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 9064 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 907 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 9072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 908 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 909 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 911 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 9113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 9115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 9119 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 9128 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 967 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 968 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 975 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 91 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 513 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |